Lammers v. State of Wisconsin

Plaintiff: James D Lammers
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2013cv00028
Filed: January 9, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Sheboygan
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/28/13 granting 11 Respondent's letter request to file dispositive motion in lieu of answer. Further ordering briefing schedule as follows: Petitioner's opposition brief due due 45 days after filing of respondent's dispositive motion; Respondent's reply due 30 days following filing of petitioner's opposition brief. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)
February 13, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/13/14 granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot motions to stay sentence 13 , 16 , 17 , 23 , 26 ; denying 27 Mo tion for Order order requiring respondent to produce records and evidence. Further ordering that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to timely file. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Rules Governing § 2254 Cases, I find that petitioner has not made the showing required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Therefore, I will not issue a certificate of appealability (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm)
January 29, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/29/15 denying 31 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm)
April 5, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/5/13 that within 30 days of the date of this order respondent ANSWER the petition, showing cause why the writ should not issue. Further ordering that unless respondent files a dispositive motion with its answer the parties shall abide by the briefing schedule in the order. See order. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner, AAG Greg Weber w/enc.)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lammers v. State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Lammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.