Lee v. Christenson

Appellant: Nikki Lee
Appellee: Leland G Christenson, II
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00126
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Ozaukee
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 11 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/1/13 AFFIRMING the order of the bankruptcy court. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to appellant)(dm)
April 2, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/2/13 that appellant shall pay the filing fee by April 22, 2013 or the case will be dismissed. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to appellant)(dm)
April 13, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/13/13 granting 8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to appellant) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee v. Christenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nikki Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leland G Christenson, II
Represented By: Daniel R Freund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]