Listecki v. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Appellant: Jerome E Listecki
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 2:2013cv00179
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/18/2013 GRANTING 10 Motion to clarify. Briefing schedule 7 is VACATED; Docketing and briefing to proceed per bankruptcy rules. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
July 29, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BANKRUPTCY APPEAL signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/29/2013. Decision of bankruptcy court REVERSED and matter REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. See Order for details. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 1, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/1/2013 GRANTING 1 Motion for Leave to Appeal. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
October 1, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 10/1/2013 DENYING 27 MOTION to Vacate Judgment and Decision and Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(B) and 28 U.S.C. § 455; DENYING 30 MOTION for Recusal of the Honorable Rudolph T. Randa from the Cemetery Trust Litigation and Cemetery Related Proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 29, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BANKRUPTCY APPEAL signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/29/15 that the bankruptcy courts decision is AFFIRMED. Consistent with the Seventh Circuits opinion, the Trusts motion for summary judgment is DENIED and the Committees motion for partial summary judgment on Count III is GRANTED. Further ordering that this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with the Seventh Circuits opinion. (cc: all counsel)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Listecki v. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jerome E Listecki
Represented By: Timothy F Nixon
Represented By: Linda S Schmidt
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Kenneth H Brown
Represented By: Jason R Pilmaier
Represented By: Albert Solochek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.