Principle Solutions LLC v. Feed.Ing BV

Plaintiff: Principle Solutions LLC
Defendant: Feed.Ing BV
Case Number: 2:2013cv00223
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/8/2015. Pages 9 and 17 of 81 Court's 9/30/2014 Order AMENDED to reflect the correct amount of damages and storage charges (see this Order for details). 110 Principle's Rule 7(h) Expedited Non- Dispositive MOTION for Ruling that no Order For Leave To Amend is Required to Amend Complaint and Add Parties GRANTED; Clerk of Court DIRECTED to file [110-1] Principle's Third Amended Complaint. 86 Principle's MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal GRANTED to the extent that Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to Seal [85-4] Unredacted Version of Exhibit C and file [98-1] Redacted Version of Exhibit C; any party/interested member of the public may challenge the sealing of Exhibit C. 87 Principle's MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of Stipulated Protective Order DENIED. 92 Feed.Ing's Expedited MOTION to Modify Blanket Protective Order GRANTED (see this Order for details). 82 Principle's MOTION for Reconsideration DENIED. 118 Principle's Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION To Vacate Court's September 30, 2014 Decision and Order DENIED. 94 Feed's Expedited MOTION for Entry of Partial Judgment DENIED. 107 Principle's Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Strike Feed's Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment DENIED. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/17/2013. On or before 9/30/2013 Principle MAY FILE second amended complaint addressing jurisdictional issues. Failure to file by stated deadline will result in dismissal of Principle's action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 30, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 5/30/2014 GRANTING 68 Motion to require Participation in Discovery. Principle and Zimmer MUST participate in discovery concerning Zimmer's alleged alter ego liability to Feed.Ing for debts of Principle. Principle and Zimmer MUST NOT REFUSE to produce documents or provide discovery on the basis that alter ego discovery should occur at some later time. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 30, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/30/2014. 31 Feed.Ing's MOTION for Summary Judgment GRANTED; 54 Zimmer's MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint GRANTED, Kevin Zimmer DISMISSED from this action; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2014 at 9:30 AM (Central Time) before Judge Rudolph T. Randa, the Court will initiate the call. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 5, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/5/2013. On or before 7/8/2013 Principle Solutions MAY FILE amended complaint establishing subject matter jurisdiction, failure to file will result in dismissal. See Order for details. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principle Solutions LLC v. Feed.Ing BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principle Solutions LLC
Represented By: Christopher T Hale
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feed.Ing BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]