Wood v. Billings et al

Defendant: Sue Nygren, Mark Bender, Patricia Billings and Sue Neil
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Wood, Jr
Case Number: 2:2013cv00281
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Racine
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/1/2013. 6/17/2013 Order and Judgment dismissing this case are VACATED, case to be REOPENED. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED. Defendants to file responsive pleading within 60 day s of electronic receipt of this Order. Wis. Dept. of Corrections to collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account $336.22 balance of filing fee in accordance with 28 USC §1915(b)(2). (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lorenzo Wood; Warden-Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
January 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/28/2014. 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff may proceed on 8th Amendment claim against Defendants Billings, Neil, and Bender. All other complaints and defendants DIS MISSED; Clerk of Court to file Amended Complaint which will be operative complaint in this action. Defendants to file responsive pleading to Amended Complaint. 22 28 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment DENIED without prejudice. 32 MOTION to Stay DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lorenzo Wood at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
September 8, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/8/2014. 36 Defendants Billings and Neil's MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies DENIED; 40 Defendant Bender's MOTION for Summary Judgment GRANTED, Bender DISMISSED from this case; 52 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lorenzo Wood, Jr. at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Billings et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Nygren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bender
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Billings
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Neil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Wood, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]