Bach v. Milwaukee County Circuit Court et al

Defendant: Milwaukee County, Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Elizabeth Ruthmansdorfer, Life Navigators and Disability Rights Wisconsin Inc
Plaintiff: Margaret Bach
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00370
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 44 , 46 , 48 , 50 , 54 , 59 , 63 . IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the plaintiff's motions to appoint a guardian ad litem are DENIED 4 , 25 . IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the plaintiff's reques t to compel police reports is DENIED 88 . IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for default judgment is DENIED 89 . IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the motions to strike are GRANTED to the extent that Docket # 114, 115, 117, and 125 are unauthorized sur-replies to the defendants respective motions to dismiss 120 , 132 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel) (Plaintiff by USPS) (teb)
April 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 4/30/2013 DENYING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff has until 5/31/13 to file an amended complaint and pay the filing fee. (cc: all counsel, mailed to plaintiff) (djd)
June 5, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/5/13 denying 24 Plaintiff's Amended Petition for a Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction. See Order. (cc: Plaintiff, all counsel) (nm)
July 10, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 37 Motion to Void State Court Order Regarding Transcripts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 7/10/2013. (cc: all counsel, Plaintiff by USPS) (teb)
July 19, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 7/18/2013 denying plaintiff's 75 Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal. (cc: all counsel, mailed to plaintiff via USPS) (djd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bach v. Milwaukee County Circuit Court et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Circuit Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ruthmansdorfer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Navigators
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Rights Wisconsin Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Bach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]