Harris v. Hallisy et al

Defendant: John Morrisey, David Beth and Robert Hallisy
Plaintiff: Brian Ivy Scott Harris
Case Number: 2:2013cv00471
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Kenosha
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/26/2013. Effective 9/18/2013 this action to be dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution unless prior to that date plaintiff files amended complaint or establishes just cause for failure to do so. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Brian Harris at Kenosha County Detention Center)(cb)
November 13, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/13/2013. Case DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (cc: via US mail to Brian Harris at Kenosha County Detention Center)(cb)
June 11, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/11/2013 GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 7/8/2013 Plaintiff to file amended pleading curing defects in original complaint (see Order for details). Kenosha County Sher iff to collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $347.07 balance of the filing fee. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Brian Harris at Kenosha County Detention Center, Kenosha County Sheriff, Corey Finkelmeyer-Asst. Atty. General) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Hallisy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morrisey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hallisy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ivy Scott Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]