US Bank NA et al v. Pulsifer et al

Defendant: Laura L Pulsifer and Lee H Pulsifer
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and US Bank NA
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00648
Filed: June 10, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/8/2014. MOTION to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 8 in Bankruptcy Case 13-2176) GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint GRANTED; Amended Complaint to be filed within 5 days of the date of this Order. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2014 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Judge Rudolph T. Randa; the Court will initiate the call. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 26, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/26/2013 GRANTING 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/30/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Rudolph T. Randa, the Court will initiate the call. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 23, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/23/2014. 21 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Reconsideration DENIED. 19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment DENIED. 26 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment GRANTED. Matter REMANDED to bankruptcy court for further proceedings consistent with this Order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: US Bank NA et al v. Pulsifer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura L Pulsifer
Represented By: Rollie R Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee H Pulsifer
Represented By: Rollie R Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Rachel M Blise
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank NA
Represented By: Rachel M Blise
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]