Big Daddy Games v. Reel Spin Studios LLC et al

Defendant: William Stimac, Michael Lindeman, Rhody R Mallick, Dale Cebula, Kathleen Maloney, Matthew Barrett, Robert L Diener, The Lyons Den DL LLC, Nigls Inc, Gameday Sports Bar Inc, Antlers Sports Bar & Grill LLC, Oshkosh Lanes LLC, Back Again Stadium Bar Inc, Mr D's Two LLC, Susie's Trackside LLC, Last Hurrah LLC, Hotel Pub LLP, Wood Shed Inc, George Simonis, Q Game Technologies Pty Ltd, Nick McLeod, Reel Spin Studios, LLC, Game Management Corporation, James L Donker, David E Grond and Patrick Young
Plaintiff: Big Daddy Games
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00449
Filed: June 26, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 116 Response to Order filed by George Simonis. The parties may negotiate an extension and report to the court on an agreement. If no agreement is reached, the 11/28/12 order (dkt. 115 ) remains in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/29/12. (rep)
April 10, 2013 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties have until 4/11/13 at 3:00 pm to object to the court advising Solicitor O'Connor that it is not necessary to depose John Paul Jones. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/10/13. (rep)
August 16, 2013 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 332 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Order 331 is vacated and this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs subject to the terms of 330 settlement agreement. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/16/13. (rep)
January 9, 2014 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 335 Motion for Judgments against defendants. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/9/14. (rep)
June 25, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin; denying 45 Motion for Attorney Fees; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 06/25/2012 (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)[Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Big Daddy Games v. Reel Spin Studios LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stimac
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lindeman
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhody R Mallick
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cebula
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Maloney
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Barrett
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Diener
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lyons Den DL LLC
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigls Inc
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gameday Sports Bar Inc
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antlers Sports Bar & Grill LLC
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oshkosh Lanes LLC
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Back Again Stadium Bar Inc
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr D's Two LLC
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie's Trackside LLC
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last Hurrah LLC
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Pub LLP
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Shed Inc
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Simonis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Game Technologies Pty Ltd
Represented By: Travis James West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick McLeod
Represented By: Travis James West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reel Spin Studios, LLC
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Game Management Corporation
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Donker
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E Grond
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Young
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Albert Bianchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Daddy Games
Represented By: Douglas J. Marsch
Represented By: Christopher P. Banaszak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]