Means, Jerry v. Cox

Defendant: Cox
Plaintiff: Jerry Means
Case Number: 3:2013cv00146
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 10 renewed request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may have until September 6, 2013, to submit the entire $350 filing fee for this case. If plaintiff fails to submit this fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/23/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for the court to certify that an interlocutory appeal may be taken from the August 23, 2013 order in this case. Leave to proceed ifp on appeal is denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute it. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/1/2013. (elc),(ps)
October 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute it. ( ELC) (elc),(ps)
May 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 motion to amend request for relief; denying without prejudice 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Amended Complaint and Trust Fund Account Statement due 5/29/2013.) Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/8/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Means, Jerry v. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Means
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]