Smith, Derrick v. Meisner, Michael et al

Defendant: Jane Doe, Doctor, Michael Meisner and Jane Doe, Health Service Manager
Plaintiff: Derrick L. Smith
Case Number: 3:2013cv00387
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's request for leave to proceed and dismissing his complaint without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies as required by 42 U.S.C. § 1997a(e). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/25/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
June 4, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff is to submit by June 18, 2013 a complaint on the form provided by the clerk's office and either the filing fee or a request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a certified copy of plaintiff's trust fund account statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/4/2013. (elc),(ps)
June 28, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 6 motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Initial partial filing fee of $ 2.30 assessed. (Initial partial filing fee due 7/26/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/28/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith, Derrick v. Meisner, Michael et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, Doctor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meisner
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, Health Service Manager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick L. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]