Saffold v. Watson-Foster et al (INMATE1)

Case Number: 1:2005cv00193
Filed: March 1, 2005
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
Referring Judge: Delores R. Boyd
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2006 21 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff; that this action is dismissed with prejudice and that the defendants recover the costs of this action. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
December 11, 2006 20 Featured Case ORDER adopting 16 Report and Recommendations; granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Wambles; granting judgment in favor of defendant Wambles; dismissing this case with prejudice; taxing costs of this proceeding against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/2006. (cc, )
December 11, 2006 19 Featured Case ORDER vacating 17 Order adopting the Report and Recommendation and 18 Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/11/2006. (cc, )
December 8, 2006 18 Featured Case VACATED PURSUANT TO 19 ORDER. FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff, that this action is DISMISSED and costs are taxed against the plaintiff; that the clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/8/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, ) Modified on 12/11/2006 (cc, ).
December 8, 2006 17 Featured Case VACATED PURSUANT TO 19 ORDER. ORDER adopting 16 Report and Recommendation; granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting judgment in favor of defendant Wambles; dismissing this case with prejudice; taxing costs against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/8/2006. (cc, ) Modified on 12/11/2006 (cc, ).
November 17, 2006 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Wambles be granted; that Judgment be granted in favor of Wambles; that this case be dismissed with prejudice; that costs of this proceedings be taxed against the plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2006. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 11/17/2006. (cc, )
September 13, 2006 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harry Edward Saffold, Jr. See 15 Response for pdf document for this entry. (cc, )
September 13, 2006 15 RESPONSE to 14 Order to Show Cause by Harry Edward Saffold, Jr. (cc, )
August 25, 2006 14 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to comply with the orders of this court and his failure to adequately prosecute this action. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2006 for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 8/25/2006. (cc, )
August 24, 2005 Partial Filing fee: $ 15.82, receipt number 107450 (djy, )
July 26, 2005 Partial Filing fee: $ 22.78, receipt number 107101 (cc, )
June 23, 2005 Partial Filing fee: $ 37.76, receipt number 106772 (cc, )
May 27, 2005 Partial Filing fee: $ 17.85, receipt number 106478 (cc, )
April 25, 2005 13 Featured Case ORDER adopting 7 Report and Recommendations; that the claims related to threats, abusive language and/or derogatory comments lodged against defendants Lambert, Judd, Sapp, Wambles, Dunn, Terry, McCovery, Byrd and Conners are dismissed with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the erratic driving claim against defendant Byrd is dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the directive of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the claim presented against defendant Watson-Foster is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that defendants Lambert, Judd, Sapp, Dunn, Terry, McCovery, Byrd, Conners and Watson-Foster are dismissed from this cause of action; that the equal protection claims lodged against defendant Wambles are referred back to the magistrate judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/25/2005. (Attachments: # 1 PLRA Notice# 2 Civil Appeals Checklist) (cc, )
April 20, 2005 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Harry Edward Saffold, Jr. (cc, )
April 8, 2005 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 10.09, receipt number 105940 (cc, )
April 7, 2005 11 Featured Case ORDER directing the plaintiff that on or before 4/27/2005 to file a response to 10 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Robert Wambles. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 4/7/2005. (cc, )
April 7, 2005 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Robert Wambles (cc, )
April 6, 2005 10 Special Report and Answer treated as a MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert Wambles pursuant to Report and Recommendations of 11/17/2006. (cc, )
April 6, 2005 10 SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Robert Wambles.(Redd, Andrew)
March 28, 2005 No objections have been filed to 7 report and recommendations. (cc, )
March 14, 2005 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint signed by Mitchell Peets for Robert Wambles served on 3/10/2005, answer due 4/19/2005. (cc, )
March 9, 2005 8 NOTICE of Correction re 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and 6 Order (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Document# 2 Corrected Document)(cc, )
March 7, 2005 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the claims related to threats, abusive language and/or derogatory comments lodged against defendants Lambert, Judd, Sapp, Wambles, Dunn, Terry, McCovery, Byrd and Conners be dismissed with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the erratic driving claim against defendant Byrd be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the claim presented against defendant Watson-Foster be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that defendants Lambert, Judd, Sapp, Dunn, Terry, McCovery, Byrd, Conners and Watson-Foster be dismissed from this cause of action; that the equal protection claims lodged against defendant Wambles be referred back to the magistrate judge for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2005. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 3/7/2005. (cc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2005 (cc, ).
March 7, 2005 6 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 40 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to defendant Wambles; mailed w/copy of complaint to General Counsel for DOC & AG. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 3/7/2005. (cc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2005 (cc, ).
March 4, 2005 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Elba Community Based Facility. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 3/4/2005. (cc, )
March 1, 2005 Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number CV-94-B-3238-S. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(sl, )
January 18, 2005 4 Order entered by the USDC, Northern District of Alabama, transferring this action to the Middle District of Alabama. (sl, )
December 6, 2004 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 3 Order. This document was modified to reflect that Document #3 is a Recommendation from the Magistrate Judge rather than an Order transferring case. (sl, )
December 6, 2004 3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this action be transferred to the USDC Middle District of Alabama. (sl, ) Modified on 3/3/2005 to reflect that this document is a RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE rather than an Order.
November 17, 2004 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Harry Edward Saffold, Jr. (sl, ) Modified on 8/25/2006 to correct the file date to 11/17/04 (cc, ).
November 17, 2004 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Willie E. Terry, Jennifer McCovery, D'Angelo Byrd, Doug Conners, Lily Watson-Foster, Keiff Lambert, Floyd Judd, Edward Sapp, Robert Wambles, Jason Dunn , filed by Harry Edward Saffold, Jr.(sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saffold v. Watson-Foster et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?