Wiley v. Glover et al (INMATE1)

Case Number: 1:2005cv01156
Filed: December 7, 2005
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1)The 38 Order Adopting 37 Report and Recommendation and 39 Final Judgment are VACATED; (2) Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Alter Judgment is DENIED as moot; (3) Plaintiff shall file any objections he may have to the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge on or before 11/3/08. **A copy of the R&R provided to plaintiff** Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/17/2008. (cb, ) Modified on 10/17/2008 to reflect that 38 Order is VACATED rather than the report and recommendation (cb, ).
September 25, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court (ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO 41 ORDER) ORDER ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and that: 1. The claims against Houston County Jail Staff are DISMISSED. 2. The Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of the properly named defendants is GRANT ED. 3. Judgment is entered in favor of all defendants. 4. The costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plaintiff. 5. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/25/2008. (dmn) Modified on 10/17/2008 to vacate order. (cb, ).
September 3, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) The claims aginst Houston County Jail be dismissed; (2) The 14 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; (3) Judgment be entered in favor of all defendants; (4) The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff; and (5) This case be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2008. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/3/2008. (cb, )
December 16, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk . Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/16/05. (ajr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Glover et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?