McDonnell v. Glover et al (INMATE1)

Case Number: 1:2006cv00447
Filed: May 18, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 13 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Mr. Jason J. McDonnell's failure to comply with the orders of this court. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 2/19/2009. (wcl, )
February 4, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plf to comply with the orders of this court; Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/4/2009. (wcl, )
May 22, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Houston County Jail. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/22/2006. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonnell v. Glover et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?