Richards v. Coffee County Sheriff Department et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Anthony Richards, Sr.
Defendant: Dave Sutton, Richard B. Moss, Dallas Gibson and Dr. Meloni
Case Number: 1:2007cv00261
Filed: March 26, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Coffee
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Meloni and Dallas Gibson are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of service in accordance with FRCP 4(m). Defendants Sutton and Moss's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The claims against Defendants Sutton and Moss are DISMISSED with prejudice. The costs of this proceeding shall be TAXED against the Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 9/9/2009. (dmn)
August 17, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, 12 Amendment to Complaint filed by Anthony Richards, Sr., and MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard B. Moss, Dave Sutton that: 1. Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Meloni and Dallas Gibson be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of service in accordance with the provisions of FRCP 4(m). 2. This case against Defendants Meloni and Gibson be DISMISSED without prejudice as Plaintiff has failed to perfect service on these defendants. 3. Defendants Sutton and Moss' 29 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED. 4. This case be DISMISSED with prejudice against Defendants Sutton and Moss; 5. Judgment be ENTERED in favor of Defendants Sutton and Moss and against Plaintiff; 6. The costs of this proceeding be taxed against Plaintiff for which execution may issue. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/17/2009. (dmn)
March 30, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Anthony Richards, Sr., that Plaintiff's claims against the Coffee County Sheriff's Department be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and that this party be dismissed as a defendant to this complaint. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2007. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/30/2007. (dmn)
March 28, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/28/2007. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Coffee County Sheriff Department et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Sutton
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Moss
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Meloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Richards, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?