Council v. Sutton et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Timothy Council
Defendant: Dave Sutton, Richard B. Moss, Glenn Shelton, Alston Redman and Neal Bradley
Case Number: 1:2007cv00331
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Coffee
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, as stated by the Court in the hearing held at 9:00 a.m. on Friday, June 18, 2010 in the United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Courtroom 2A, Montgomery, Alabama, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) On or before June 25, 2010, th e plaintiff shall, pursuant to the provision of Rule 26(a)(3) of the FRCP, furnish opposing counsel for copying and inspection all exhibits or tangible evidence to be used at the trial, and proffering counsel shall have such evidence marked for ident ification prior to trial, as further set out in order; (2) On or before June 25, 2010, the plaintiff shall file with the court a list of all witnesses expected to be called by them to testify at the trial, and to furnish opposing counsel with a copy of the witness list, as further set out in order; (3) On or before June 25, 2010, the plaintiff shall file written objections to the defendants' exhibits and/or witness list, as further set out in order; (4) On or before July 2, 2010, the defend ants shall file written objections to the plaintiff's exhibits and/or witness list, as further set out in order; and (5) The plaintiff and defendants may, but are not required to, file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Any proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law must be filed on or before July 6, 2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/18/10. (scn, )
October 27, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 41 : ORDER that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2009 is rescheduled for 12/2/2009 at the United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Courtroom 2A, in Montgomery, AL before Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller. A fin al pretrial order will be entered by the Court at a later date. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order to the Department of Corrections. The persons having custody of the plaintiff are DIRECTED to produce him at the pretrial conference. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/27/2009. Copies furnished to YG, HC, KG, ALDOC Transport Agent, and USM.(dmn) Modified on 10/29/2009 (br, ).
June 8, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that: 1. The defendants' motion for summary judgment regarding the plaintiff's claims for monetary damages lodged against them in their official capacities be GRANTED as the defendants are entitled to absolute immu nity from these claims. 2. The defendants' motion for summary judgment filed on behalf of Dave Sutton and Richard Moss with respect to the plaintiff's excessive force claims presented against these defendants in the remaining aspects of the ir official capacities and in all aspects of their individual capacities be GRANTED. 3. The defendants' motion for summary judgment be GRANTED in favor of Dave Sutton and Glenn Shelton as to the plaintiff's claim of intimidation and derogat ion. 4. The defendants' motion for summary judgment regarding the plaintiff's excessive force claims against Glenn Shelton, Alston Redman and Neal Bradley in their official capacities for declaratory or injunctive relief and all aspects of their individual capacities be DENIED. 5. This case be set for a bench trial before the district judge assigned this case on the plaintiff's surviving excessive force claims against Glenn Shelton, Alston Redman and Neal Bradley. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/8/2009. (dmn)
April 18, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Coffee County Jail. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/18/07. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Council v. Sutton et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Sutton
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Moss
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Shelton
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alston Redman
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Bradley
Represented By: Gary L. Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?