Hooks v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quiten Hooks
Defendant: Houston County Jail, Correction Office Dykes and Jason Smokes
Case Number: 1:2008cv00776
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Houston
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 1/27/09 plf shall file a response to the defendant's written report, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/6/09. (djy, )
November 17, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED granting 22 Motion to Amend Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent Plaintiff seeks to named "Medical Department" as a defendant the motion is DENIED. To the extent Plaintiff seeks to amend relief sought in the complaint, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/17/2008. (cb, )
October 16, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 5 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge isADOPTED; Plaintiff's claims against Houston County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B)(i); The Houston County Jail is DISMISSED as a party to this complaint; and that with respect to the remaining Defendants, this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 10/16/2008. (cb, )
October 15, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; (2) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint wherein he seeks to name the Houston County Sheriff's Department as a defendant is DENIED; (3 ) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint to add additional factual allegations against Defendants Smokes and Dykes in support of the original complaint be and is hereby GRANTED; ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT that on or before 11/17/08 the Defendan ts shall file an answer and written report containing the sworn statements of all persons having knowledge of the subject matter of the complaint, as amended. Copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed via US mail with admendment to the complaint to defendants Smoke and Dykes. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/15/2008. (cb, ) Modified on 10/15/2008 to reflect that the named defendants were served by regular mail rather than CMRRR(cb, ).
September 26, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Emmanuel Quiten Hooks; it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: 1) Plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 2) The Houston County Jail be dismissed as a party to this complaint; and 3) This case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2008. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/26/08. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quiten Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Office Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?