Bell Aerospace Services, Inc. v. U.S. Aero Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bell Aerospace Services, Inc.
Defendant: Ron Donahue, Timberly (Mimi) Moore, Mike Hall and Joe Ben Thomas
Case Number: 1:2009cv00141
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: 18:1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 146 MOTION in Limine and 147 MOTION in Limine. It is ORDERED that counsel for all parties are to do the following: (1) Meet, in person, by no later than 3/16/2010, to attempt to resolve the motions; and (2) File a jointly prepared report by 3/18/2010, (a) as to which issues in the motions are resolved and which ones remain unresolved and (b), for each and every unresolved issue, setting forth in detail the position of each side. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/9/2010. (dmn)
March 5, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's 140 Objection is is overruled; that 139 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, to which defendants do not object, is adopted; that plaintiff's 120 MOTION for Default Judgment is denied; that plaintiff is permitted to present argument to the jury regarding the "lost evidence." Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/5/2010. (cc, )
February 18, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; 120 MOTION for Default Judgment be denied Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/18/2010. (jg, ) Modified on 2/22/2010 to clarify text (jg, ).
April 3, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that based on representations made in open court at the hearing held on 4/2/2009, it is ORDERED that the 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted as further set out in the order. The previous preliminary injunction (Doc. No. 20) is conv erted into a protective order, with the defendants having seven days to move to amend the protective order to provide for any desired reciprocal relief. Any motion to amend, including any disputes arising from it, is to be handled by the magistrate j udge. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff Bell Aerospace Services, Inc. has until 4/3/2009 to amend its complaint to assert diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/3/2009. (dmn) [Modified on 4/14/2009 to include the protective order text.-DMN]
February 25, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting Plaintiff Bell Aerospace Services Inc.'s 2 Motion for temporary restraining order to the extent set forth in this order; that Defendants U.S. Aero Services, Steve Matherly, Hartwell Willy Wilson, Joe Ben Th omas, Mike Hall, Rilda Blaha, Sean Taylor, Timberly Mimi Moore, Ron Donahue, Mark Robison, and those persons in active concert or participation with them or who receive actual notice of this order by personal service or otherwise, are each TEMPORARIL Y RESTRAINED from failing to take immediate and affirmative steps to comply with the following: (1) Preserving all computer files, data, documents, or similar information maintained on their computer equipment until further notice by this court. (2) Not destroying any and all information and documents that are potentially relevant to plaintiff Bell Aerospace Services Inc.'s claims. (3) This temporary restraining order shall remain in effect until 5:00 p.m. on March 6, 2009. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/25/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell Aerospace Services, Inc. v. U.S. Aero Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Donahue
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberly (Mimi) Moore
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hall
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Ben Thomas
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bell Aerospace Services, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?