Glenn Construction Company, LLC v. Bell Aerospace Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Glenn Construction Company, LLC
Defendant: Bell Aerospace Services, Inc. and Barge, Waggoner, Summer & Cannon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00250
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Dale
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that BWSC's 105 Motion to Exclude Brittingham's testimony is GRANTED as further set out in the opinion and order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff is precluded from calling Brittingham to provide expert testimony at trial. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/27/2011. (dmn)
May 19, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's 78 Motion to Supplement Evidentiary Submittal in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment of Defendants is DENIED as MOOT. 2. Plaintiff's 80 Motion to Strike Affidavits of Michael Cole and Michael Petrin is DENIED as MOOT. 3. BWSC's 82 Motion to Strike the Motion to Supplement is DENIED as MOOT. 4. BWSC's 75 Motion to Strike Brittingham's affidavit is DENIED as MOOT. 5. BWSC's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as further set out in the opinion and order. 6. Bell Aero's 32 First Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT. 7. Bell Aero's 54 Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Fuller on 5/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (dmn)
December 21, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: Ordered that the 13 Motion to Exclude Matters Extraneous to the Complaint is denied. Ordered that the 7 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted insofar as it sought dismissal of the claims against it sounding in work and labor done and open account; the motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/21/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn Construction Company, LLC v. Bell Aerospace Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Aerospace Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge, Waggoner, Summer & Cannon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?