Jones v. Ellington et al (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Sentia J. Jones
Defendant: Edward Ellington and Troy King
Case Number: 1:2009cv00302
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ADOPTING 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and that the 1 Petition for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED without prejudice to afford Jones an opportunity to exhaust all state court remedies available to her. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/15/2009. (dmn)
June 19, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sentia J. Jones be dismissed without prejudice to afford Jones an opportunity to exhaust all state court remedies available to her. Objections to R&R due by 7/2/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/19/2009. (dmn)
May 12, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before May 29, 2009, Jones shall show cause why her federal habeas petition should not be dismissed as it was not filed within the one-year limitation period established by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1); that on or before May 29, 2009, Petitioner shall show cause why her petition should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust state court remedies; that on or before May 29, 2009, Jones shall show cause why her petition should not be dismissed to the extent she challenges her convic tion and sentence in Houston County Circuit Court Case No. CC-2005-631, as she does not satisfy the "in custody" requirement necessary to allow a federal habeas attack in that matter. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/12/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ellington et al (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentia J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?