McLeod v. United States of America (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Jackie McLeod
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv00333
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Recommendation be and is hereby ADOPTED and the motion to vacate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 be and is hereby DENIED as the claims therein entitle him to no relief. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/13/2011. (jg, )
June 9, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before June 23, 2009, the petitioner shall file an amendment to his § 2255 motion specifying which of the two judgments of this court he seeks relief from through this motion; that petitioner is advised that, pursuant to Fed. R. Governing § 2255 Proceedings 2(d), he may challenge only one judgment of this court; that should he wish to challenge more than one judgment of this court, he must file a separate motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 challenging each separate judgment. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 6/9/2009. (cc, )
April 16, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before April 30, 2009, the petitioner shall file supplement to his 1 pleading that plainly states whether, by said pleading the petitioner is attacking the validity of the sentence this court imposed on him in 1993 for obstruction of justice, or whether the petitioner is challenging the October 2008 judgment of this court revoking his supervised release and imposing a 12-month term of imprisonment; denying petitioner's MOTION for appointment of counsel. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/16/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLeod v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: A. Clark Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?