Yeomans v. Forster and Howell, Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Yeomans
Defendant: Forster and Howell, Incorporated, Jack Howell and Nancy Jenkins
Case Number: 1:2009cv00488
Filed: May 26, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 alternative Motion to reconsider; denying 43 Motion to certify order for interlocutory appeal for reasons further set out in order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/11/2009. (br, )
November 30, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY and denying 37 MOTION to Extend the Stay for reasons further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/30/09. (br, )
September 22, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 33 MOTION to renew motion to stay proceedings pending outcome of criminal case is GRANTED to the extent that this case is STAYED until 11/30/2009; (2) the plf shall file an answer to the counterclaim no later than 11/30/09. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/22/09. (djy, )
September 10, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Stay without prejudice to the Plaintiff again moving for a stay at a time later in these proceeding if special circumstances arise which warrant imposition of a stay. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/10/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeomans v. Forster and Howell, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Yeomans
Represented By: Ann Carroll Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forster and Howell, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?