Shelley v. White et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Shelley
Defendant: Anthony J. White and BH Transfer Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00662
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Henry
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Plaintiff's 54 Motion in Limine #3 seeking to exclude all evidence of prior alleged safety violations and prior alleged accidents involving the Plaintiff is GRANTED to the extent set out in this Order. Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Exhibit #39 (Doc. 57 , 94 -6, 94 -7) is SUSTAINED as to all of the exhibit except the relevant portion addressing the job restrictions placed on Plaintiff, which may be admitted only upon the laying of a proper foundation. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/12/2010. (dmn)
May 11, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This cause is before the court on the Plaintiff's 57 Objections to Exhibits Designated as Evidence by the Defense, the Defendants' 62 Objections to Witnesses and Exhibits Designated by Plaintiff, 88 Unopposed Evidentiary Stipul ations, and the Defendants' 90 Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Exhibits. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' 57 Objections are OVERRULED based on stipulation of the parties, as set forth in the order, and the Defendants' 62 Objections are OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/11/2010. (dmn)
May 10, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 61 Second Motion in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as further set out in the order. Defendants' 62 Objections to Witnesses and Exhibits Designated by Plaintiff are OVERRULED as to witness Bryant Beasley and OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part as to witness Tommy Cauthen, consistent with this Order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/10/2010. (dmn)
May 6, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 69 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/6/2010. (dmn)
May 5, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' requested jury charges 1, 2, 3, and 4 are rejected, and the case will proceed on the negligence claim on a traditional negligence theory, and not a premises liability theory as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/5/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelley v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Shelley
Represented By: Harry Preston Hall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. White
Represented By: Keri Donald Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Transfer Co., Inc.
Represented By: Keri Donald Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?