Smedley v. Ozark Police Dept. et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Smedley
Defendant: Ozark Police Dept. and Officer Tripp
Case Number: 1:2009cv01061
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Dale
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, upon consideration of the prior proceedings, opinion and orders entered in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of the Defendants Officer Tripp and the City of Ozark and a gainst the Plaintiff Darrell Smedley; (2) Costs are TAXED against Plaintiff Darrell Smedley, for which execution may issue; (3) The Clerk is DIRECTED to close cases 1:09-cv-1061-MEF, 1:10-cv-301-MEF and 1:10-cv-510-MEF; (4) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/19/11. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
December 10, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that (1) The 17 and 26 Motions for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff's claims against the City of Ozark and Officer Tripp be dismissed; (3) Cases 1:09-cv-1061-MEF, 1:10-cv-301-MEF, a nd 1:10-cv-510-MEF be closed; (4) Any outstanding motions be DENIED as moot; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file any objections to the this Recommendation on or before December 27, 2010, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 12/10/10. (scn, )
March 1, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Report and Recommendation. Upon an independent review of the record and upon consideration of the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE that: (1) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ozark Pol ice Department are dismissed without prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(ii). (2) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve the Summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, a copy of all Orders entered by the Court, and a copy of the Report and Recommendation on Officer Tripp. (3) This case be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/1/2010. (dmn)
February 5, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint and 8 Amended Complaint that: (1) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ozark Police Department be dismissed without prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to 28 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)( i)-(ii). (2) The Clerk of Court be DIRECTED to serve Summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, a copy of all Orders entered by the Court, and a copy of this Report and Recommendation on Officer Tripp. (3) This case be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/5/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smedley v. Ozark Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Smedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?