Hunter v. Easterling et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Hunter
Defendant: Easterling, Department of Corrections and Alfa Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00302
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Coffee
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 11 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; and that the appeal in this cause is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. § 1915(a), as not taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 8/18/2010. (dmn)
July 27, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. Plaintiff's 8 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and the same is hereby OVERRULED. 2. The 7 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge be and the same is hereby ADOPTED, APPROVED, and AFFIRMED. 3. Pla intiffs' complaint against the Easterling Correctional Facility, the Alabama Department of Corrections, and the Alfa Insurance Company be and the same is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); and 4. Plain tiff's 1 complaint be and the same is hereby DISMISSED prior to service of process. The Court will enter a separate final judgment. The Court emphasizes that this order only forecloses suit against the defendants listed in the complaint. To th e extent the Plaintiff seeks information related to the automobile accident, information may be available by writing to the Alabama Department of Public Safety, P.O. Box 1471, Montgomery, Alabama 36102. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 7/27/2010. (dmn)
April 26, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $21.74 be paid on or before 5/17/2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Elba Work Release Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/26/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Easterling et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?