Cabrera-Geronimo v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Antioco Cabrera-Geronimo
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2010cv00674
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 MOTION to Continue as follows: (1) the Evidentiary Hearing previously set for 8/23/2012 be and is hereby rescheduled for 8/31/2012 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker, in Courtroom 5B FMJ USCC, Montgomery, AL; (2) directing the Clerk to make arrangements for the assistance of a Spanish language court interpreter at the 8/31/2012 evidentiary hearing; (3) the United States Marshal is directed to produce defendant for the hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/16/12. Furnished to calendar group, JT & US Marshal.(djy, )
July 20, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 16 motion to transport petitioner early is GRANTED; the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to transport the petitioner to the Middle District of Alabama for consultation with counsel and preparation for the evidentiary hearing set for August 23, 2012, as soon as is reasonably possible given the Marshal Services other obligations. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/20/12. (Furnished to BOP and USMS via CM/ECF.) (scn, )
July 18, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: Pursuant to CJA 20, Thomas Brantley, a CJA panel attorney, is hereby appointed to represent the petitioner at an evidentiary hearing, as further set out; Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 8/15/2012, at 09:30 AM, before Honorab le Judge Susan Russ Walker; Counsel for the United States shall make the necessary arrangements to set up the conference call; Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/23/2012, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 5B, before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker; The petition er shall be brought to this district not less than a week in advance of the scheduled evidentiary hearing, as further set out; DIRECTING the Clerk to make arrangements for the assistance of a Spanish Language court interpreter at the 8/23/2012, evide ntiary hearing; Counsel for the petitioner and counsel for the United States shall exchange, and file with the court, lists of witnesses and exhibits not later than 8/20/2012, as further set out; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve this order upon counsel for the petitioner and to make the case file available as reasonably requested. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/18/2012. (furn: Calendar, jt, BOP, USMS, Interpreter Group) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera-Geronimo v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antioco Cabrera-Geronimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: A. Clark Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?