Newman v. Hetzel et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Johnny Jesse Newman
Defendant: Gary Hetzel and Troy King
Case Number: 1:2010cv00811
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before December 22, 2011, the Respondents shall provide a copy of the records from the petitioner's criminal trial, including the trial transcript and any mental health records, as well as the record from his third state post-conviction petition, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/13/11. (scn, )
February 28, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Next Friend Status, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/28/11. (scn, )
November 30, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before December 21, 2010 Petitioner shall show cause why the instant petition for federal habeas corpus relief should not be dismissed as it was not filed within a reasonable time after enactment of the AEDPA. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/30/10. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Hetzel et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Jesse Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?