Stough v. Silva et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Joseph David Stough
Defendant: Troy Silva and William Maddox
Case Number: 1:2010cv00883
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Henry
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The plf's 28 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; 2) The 27 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; 3) The dfts' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; and 4) Costs are taxed against plf for which execution may issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/25/2013. (wcl, )
January 19, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before February 9, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' 12 answer and written report as further set out. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/19/2011. (jg, )
October 22, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/22/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stough v. Silva et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph David Stough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?