Davis v. Andrews et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Demarlos Davis
Defendant: Max Andrews, Butch Benford and Judge White
Case Number: 1:2010cv00902
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. Plaintiff's 8 Objection be and the same is hereby OVERRULED; 2. The 7 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and the same is hereby ADOPTED, APPROVED and AFFIRMED; 3. Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages again st Jerry White, Butch Binford, and Max Andrews be and the same are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii); 4. Plaintiff's conspiracy claim be a nd the same is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); and 5. To the extent the Plaintiff presents claims challenging the constitutionality of a criminal charge pending against him before the Circuit Court of Houston County, Alabama, these claims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 11/29/2010. (dmn)
November 4, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE; that 1. The plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Jerry White, Butch Binford and Max Andrews be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii). 2. The plaintiff's conspiracy claim be DISMISSED with prejudices pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). 3. To the extent the plaintiff presents claims challenging the constitutionali ty of a criminal charge pending against him before the Circuit Court of Houston County, Alabama, these claims be DISMISSED without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); that on or before November 18, 2010 the parties may file objections to this Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/4/2010. (jg, )
October 27, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/27/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Andrews et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarlos Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Benford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?