Dialysis Clinic, Inc. et al v. City of Dothan, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Dialysis Clinic, Inc. and Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: City of Dothan, Alabama, Bay Line Railroad, LLC, Chattahoochee Bay Railroad, Inc. and Northstar Engineering Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01051
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) the Clinic's 90 MOTION Exclude Expert Opinions of Chester Rhodes and Burl Daniel is GRANTED as to the opinions challenged in that motion; (2) the Clinic's 91 MOTION to exclude the testimony of Larry Young is GRANTED as to the opinions challenged in that motion, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/9/12. (djy, )
November 1, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Railroads' 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED on the claim of wantonness as further set out in the order. As to the other questions raised in the Railroads motion, any compensatory damages du e for harm to the Clinics real and personal property will be measured with the old but trusty diminution-in-value rule that Alabama courts have applied for decades. The Clinics entitlement to future lost profits can be resolved only at trial. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/1/2012. (dmn, )
May 9, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the 11 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/9/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dialysis Clinic, Inc. et al v. City of Dothan, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Wesley Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Wesley Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dothan, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Line Railroad, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattahoochee Bay Railroad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Engineering Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?