Peoplessouth Bank v. Farmer & Malone, P.A.

Plaintiff: Peoplessouth Bank
Defendant: Farmer & Malone, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00036
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff PeoplesSouth Bank's 95 MOTION to Strike is granted as to PeoplesSouth Bank v. Farmer & Malone, civil action no. 1:11cv36-MHT, and this case will proceed nonjury. PeoplesSouth Bank v. North, civil action no. 1:11cv176-MHT, will still proceed with a jury. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/6/2012. (cc, )
May 23, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 92 MOTION to Dismiss is granted; that Counts one, two, and three of the complaint in civil action no. 1:11cv176-MHT are dismissed; that Count six (for declaratory judgment) in the counterclaim in civil action no. 1:11cv176-MHT is d ismissed; that the following claims are left in this litigation: (1) Plaintiff PeoplesSouth Bank's claim against defendant Farmer & Malone, P.A., under the Alabama Legal Services Liability Act in civil action no. 1:11cv36-MHT; (2) Plaintiff Peop lesSouth Bank's guaranty claim against defendant Charles North in civil action no. 1:11cv176-MHT; (3) All of defendant Charles North's counterclaims, except count six, against plaintiff PeoplesSouthBank in civil action no. 1:11cv176-MHT. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/23/2012. (cc, )
May 8, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff PeoplesSouth Bank's 70 motion for leave to amend its complaint is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/8/2012. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoplessouth Bank v. Farmer & Malone, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoplessouth Bank
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Represented By: Joseph Wallace Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmer & Malone, P.A.
Represented By: Wade Hampton Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?