Employers Mutual Casualty Company v. Carl Hobbs Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Defendant: Carl Hobbs Construction Company, Inc., Carl Hobbs, Donald Trawick, David Alford and Caroline Alford
Case Number: 1:2011cv00643
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Continue Trial 71 is GRANTED, and thus, trial of the instant case is continued generally. Further, the parties are ORDERED to file their joint stipulation of dismissal by Friday, November 30, 2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/30/2012. (jg, ) TERMINATED: Non-Jury Trial 11/05/2012
October 17, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court finds the Construction Company Defendants' Partially Opposed 61 Motion to Continue Trial is due to be and hereby is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/17/2012. (jg, )
October 10, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that oral argument is set for 36 , 54 , 55 motions on October 12, 2012, at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom 2A, United States Courthouse, Montgomery, Alabama; that the pretrial hearing currently set in this matter will immediately follow oral argument on the above motions. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/10/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers Mutual Casualty Company v. Carl Hobbs Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Martin
Represented By: James Alfred Kee, Jr.
Represented By: Jon Melvin Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Hobbs Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Hobbs
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trawick
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alford
Represented By: Stephen Talmadge Etheredge, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Alford
Represented By: Stephen Talmadge Etheredge, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?