Barkley v. City of Dothan et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Andrew Keith Barkley
Defendant: City of Dothan, Dothan City Jail and Mamie McCory
Case Number: 1:2011cv00737
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED; 2. The defendants' motion for summary judgment be and is hereby GRANTED as further set out; 3. This case be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice as further set out; 4. Costs of this proceeding be and are hereby TAXED against the plaintiff for which execution may issue. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/25/2013. (jg, )
October 17, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. That the 5 Recommendation be and is hereby ADOPTED. 2. That the plaintiff's claims against the Dothan City Jail be and are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) (i). 3. That the Dothan City Jail be and is hereby DISMISSED as a defendant in this cause of action. 4. That this case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants regarding the conditions at the Dothan City Jail, be and is hereby REFERRED BACK to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 10/17/2011. (jg, )
September 9, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Dothan City Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/9/2011. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkley v. City of Dothan et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dothan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dothan City Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie McCory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Keith Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?