Hall v. Hunter (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Jimmy Earl Hall
Defendant: Bailiff Hunter
Case Number: 1:2011cv00759
Filed: September 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: St. Clair
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, upon consideration of the prior proceedings, opinions and orders entered in this case, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff, and that this action be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 4/9/12. (scn, )
March 20, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be and is hereby DENIED; it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for the plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case; further ORDERED that on or before April 3, 2012 the parties may file objections to the Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/20/12. (scn, )
November 10, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 9 Recommendation; dismissing the plaintiff's claims against Geneva County, Alabama and Andy Hughes with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); dismissing Geneva County, Alabama and Andy Hughes as parties; referring the plaintiff's claims against defendant deputy Hunter back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 11/10/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Hunter (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Earl Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailiff Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?