Forsythe v. Lt. Kirsey et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Gregory Forsythe
Defendant: Lt. Kirsey and Lt. Buckman
Case Number: 1:2012cv00033
Filed: January 11, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The plf's 33 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; 2) The 32 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; 3) The dfts' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED to the extent the dfts seek dismissal of this case due to the plf's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy previously available to him at the Houston County Jail; and 4) This case is dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 USC § 1997e(a) for the plf's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy provided to him during his confinement in the Houston County Jail as this remedy is no longer available to him with respect to the claim presented in this cause of action. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/25/2013. (wcl, )
February 28, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1. The Recommendation 9 of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. Plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail are dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i);3. The Houston Cou nty Jail is dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action; and 4. This case, with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Kirsey and Buckman, is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 2/28/2012. (jg, )
January 12, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/12/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsythe v. Lt. Kirsey et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Kirsey
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Buckman
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Forsythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?