The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Charles E. Jones, Charles H. Jones, Penny Jones, H.W., Douglas Wells, Vicki Wells, R.R., Ronald Ratchford, Rebecca Ratchford, Misty Wells, Terry James Johnson, Cody Johnson, Tammy Jane Armstrong and Michael Allen Vines
Case Number: 1:2012cv00307
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: Plaintiff Travelers Home and Marine InsuranceCompany should file a brief addressing the two concerns in this order by May 6, 2013; The defendants are to file briefs by May 13, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/29/2013. (jg, )
January 25, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that plaintiff Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company's motion to dismiss defendant Tammy Jane Armstrong, orally made on the record on January 23, 2013, is granted and that defendant Armstrong is dismissed without prejudice and t erminated as a party; that the motion for default judgment as to defendant Tanny Jane Armstrong [39) is denied as moot; The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/25/2013. (jg, )
August 6, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the notices of voluntary dismissal 36 & 37 , it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that defendants Cody Johnson and Michael Allen Vines and the claims against them are dismissed without prejudice, with costs taxe d as paid. The court assumes that the defendants have no objection to the allowance of the dismissal; however, if they do, they must file the objections within seven days from the date of this order. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/6/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Brenen Gene Ely
Represented By: Candace LeAnn Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.W.
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wells
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Wells
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R.
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ratchford
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Ratchford
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Jane Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Allen Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?