Davidson v. McSwain-Holland et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Davidson
Defendant: Sharon McSwain-Holland, Jesse Youngblood and James Smith
Case Number: 1:2012cv00687
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. Mr. Davidson's 37 objection is OVERRULED. 2. The 36 Recommendation is ADOPTED. 3. Mr. Davidson's 18 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Smith-James is GRANTED, and Defendant Smith-James is DISMISSED with prejudice. 4. Defendants Sharon McSwain-Holland's and Jesse Youngblood's 15 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. 5. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/12/2015. (kh, )
July 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 23 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for plf's failures to prosecute this action properly and to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/16/2014. (wcl, )
September 14, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The petitioner's objection 12 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on September 7, 2012 is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 9 filed on August 27, 2012 is adopted; Plaintiff's clai ms against the Alabama Department of Corrections is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). 4. The Alabama Department of Corrections is DISMISSED as a party to this complaint. 5. This case with respect to the remaining defendants is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/14/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. McSwain-Holland et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon McSwain-Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?