Childs v. Dale County Board of Education

Plaintiff: Susan Tater Childs
Defendant: Dale County Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2013cv00582
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/14/2016. (kh, )
January 6, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees (Doc. # 69 ) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs are awarded $103,965 in attorneys' fees and $874.69 in costs. 3. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply (Doc. # 76 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/6/2016. (kh, )
September 28, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED with respect to Count I. It is DENIED with respect to Counts II, III, and IV. (2) Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's motion is GRANTED with respect to the equal protection claim asserted in Count IV. Defendant's motion is GRANTED with respect to any ADA or § 504 discrimination or retaliation claim arising from J.S.R.'s exclusion from playing baseball. Defendant's motion is DENIED with respect to Counts I, II, III, and the remainder of Count IV. (3) Defendant's alternative motion fo r judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. On or before October 26, 2015, Plaintiffs shall submit their request for attorney's fees owed for the administrative due process hearing. Defendant may file any objections to Plaintiffs' fee request on or before November 9, 2015. The parties shall consider the IDEAs statutory standards for fee awards and related costs. See 20 U.S.C. § 1415(i)(3)(C)(G). Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/28/2015. (kh, ) (Main Document 64 replaced on 9/28/2015) (kh, ). Modified on 9/28/2015 to replace main pdf document and correct typographical errors (kh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childs v. Dale County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tater Childs
Represented By: Bobbie Shaw Crook
Represented By: Michael P. Lasseter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?