Carney v. City of Dothan (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)

Plaintiff: Raemonica Carney
Defendant: City of Dothan
Case Number: 1:2014cv00392
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf's 86 Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate the Decree, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a New Trial is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/13/2016. (wcl, )
January 28, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that Defendant's 43 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's 67 motion to set aside order on motion for leave to file amended complaint is DENIED as moot. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/28/2016. (kh, )
May 11, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court (STRICKEN AS A CLERICAL ERROR - DOCKETED IN THE WRONG CIVIL ACTION) JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, as further set o ut in judgment; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/11/2015. (furn: calendar, ag, wr) (term: PTC for 09/24 /2015; Jury Trial for 10/26/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, ) (Main Document 39 replaced on 5/11/2015) (wcl, ). Modified on 5/11/2015 to strike the erroneous docket entry due to a clerical error and to reflect that the PTC for 9/24/2015 and Jury Trial for 10/26/2015 are not terminated (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carney v. City of Dothan (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raemonica Carney
Represented By: Jeffrey William Bennitt(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sonya Edwards(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dothan
Represented By: Stephanie H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?