Bohannan et al v. Innovak International, Inc. (JOINT ASSIGN)

Plaintiff: Melissa Bohannan, Cherissa Hall, Jolie Hall, Summer Lisenby, Maryellen Prophet, Jennifer Matheny, Tiffany McCoy, Ashley McGhee, Sherrie Salem and Crystal Shelley
Defendant: Innovak International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00272
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2018 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: it is ORDERED that all pending motions (Docs. # 48 , 62 , and 75 ) are DENIED without prejudice with leave for the parties to renew, if necessary, after the stay is lifted. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/23/2018.(alm, )
February 16, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plfs may, but are not required to, file a sur-reply brief on or before 2/23/2018; The brief is limited to discussing Innovak's 62 motion for summary judgment as to Counts 3, 4, and 5. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/16/2018. (alm, )
January 24, 2018 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is ORDERED that the trial of this cause, presently set on 3/26/2018, is CONTINUED to the term of court commencing on 8/20/2018, in Dothan, AL, and that the pretrial hearing set for 2/1/2018, is CONTINUED to 6/28/2018, in Courtroom 2B of the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. US Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL; further ORDERED that the deadlines in the 24 Uniform Scheduling Order for filing witness lists, deposition designations, and exhibit lists (see 24 Uniform Scheduling Order §§ 9, 10 & 11) are EXTENDED to 7/9/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/24/2018. (Furnished: Calendar, AR) (Terminated: PTC for 2/1/2018; Jury Trial for 3/26/2018) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohannan et al v. Innovak International, Inc. (JOINT ASSIGN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bohannan
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherissa Hall
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolie Hall
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Lisenby
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryellen Prophet
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Matheny
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany McCoy
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley McGhee
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Salem
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Shelley
Represented By: James Christopher Cochran
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse
Represented By: Christopher Theo Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Mann
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovak International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?