Potter v. City of Dothan, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: |
David Potter |
Defendant: |
City of Dothan, Alabama, Police Chief of Dothan, Alabama, Officer Treynhm and Officer Raymott |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00749 |
Filed: |
September 9, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Dothan Office |
County: |
Houston |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles S. Coody |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 6, 2018 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The 61 Motion to Exclude is DENIED as to Drago's report and Opinion A regarding excessive force and is DENIED as moot as to the report and Opinion B regarding investigation of complaints; 2) The 66 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/6/2018. (wcl, )
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion to compel (doc. # 47 ) be and is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows:1. With respect to Request for Production # 1(k) to the City and Request forProduction # 5 to Mock and Traynoholm, the motion to compel be and is hereby GRANTED to the extent that the defendants shall produce any complaints of excessive force against the individually named defendants within three (3) years of the date of the incident that forms the ba sis of this lawsuit2. With respect to Request for Production # 11, the motion to compel be and ishereby GRANTED to the extent that the defendants shall produce any information from the individually named defendants' training files that relate to any use of force training they received within three (3) years of the date of the incident that forms the basis of this lawsuit. 3. With respect to Request for Production # 10 and # 11, the motion to compel be and is hereby DENIED as to the internal affairs investigation of the plaintiff, the internal affairs files of the individual defendants, and the complete personnel files of the individual defendants. 4. In all other aspects, the motion to compel be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/12/2017. (kh, )
|
December 20, 2016 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the individual defendants' motion to dismiss the claims against them in their official capacities (doc. # 28 ) be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims against Chief Parrish and Officers Traynham and Mock in their official capacities be and are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the defendants motion to dismiss (doc. # 16 ) filed on October 11, 2016 be and is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/20/2016. (kh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?