Miller v. Army Aviation Center Federal Credit Union

Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Appellee: Army Aviation Center Federal Credit Union
Appellant: Tylor Paul Miller
Case Number: 1:2018cv00756
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Tylor Paul Miller. (Poston, David)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal OF APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND ISSUES ON APPEAL which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Transcript of hearing held July 18, 2018)(kh, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF JOINT STIPULATION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD ON APPEAL to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation to Supplement Record on Appeal)(kh, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's transmittal of Appellant's Designation of Record on appeal which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #2 Appellant's Designations, #3 Amended Appellant Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal filed 9-7-2018, #4 Certified Docket Sheet)(kh, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number Case No. 17-11939. Appellant Brief due by 9/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 17-11393 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Conditionally Denying Relief from Stay, #3 17-11393 Certified Docket Sheet)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Army Aviation Center Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Represented By: Sabrina Lee McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Army Aviation Center Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Leonard Norman Math
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tylor Paul Miller
Represented By: David Gerald Poston
Represented By: Spencer Wade Jones
Represented By: Andrew David Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?