United States of America v. $15,000.00 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency, $4,400.00 in United States Currency and $10,450.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Maurice Kemmerlin, Robert Cox, Darolyn Kemmerlin and Terence Boley
Case Number: 1:2018cv00773
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/16/2018. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/16/2018 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/29/2018. (dmn, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Terence Boley.(Maddox, Randy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Darolyn Kemmerlin.(Maddox, Randy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Maurice Kemmerlin.(Maddox, Randy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Cox.(Maddox, Randy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 27 US Marshal ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 9/26/2018 as to Darolyn Kemmerlin re #1 Complaint, Notice, and #3 Warrant Issued. (dmn, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 US Marshal ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 9/26/2018 as to Maurice Kemmerlin re #1 Complaint, Notice, and #3 Warrant Issued. (dmn, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 25 US Marshal ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 9/26/2018 as to Robert Cox re #1 Complaint, Notice, and #3 Warrant Issued. (dmn, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 24 US Marshal ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 9/26/2018 as to Terence Boley re #1 Complaint, Notice, and #3 Warrant Issued. (dmn, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture Action and Advertisement Certification Report)(Neeley, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 22 CLAIM Ownership by Darolyn Kemmerlin by $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency. (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Bruce Maddox on behalf of $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for $4,400.00 in United States Currency (kh, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 CLAIM Ownership by Terence Boley by $4,400.00 in United States Currency. (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Bruce Maddox on behalf of $4,400.00 in United States Currency (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for $10,450.00 in United States Currency, $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency (kh, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 CLAIM Ownership by Robert Cox by $10,450.00 in United States Currency, $15,000.00 in United States Currency. (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Bruce Maddox on behalf of $10,450.00 in United States Currency, $15,000.00 in United States Currency (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 CLAIM Ownership by $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency. (Maddox, Randy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Bruce Maddox on behalf of $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency (Maddox, Randy)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 US Marshal Acknowledgement of Service: WARRANT Returned Executed via email as to Attorney Bruce Maddox, served 9/7/2018. (dmn, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 US Marshal Acknowledgement of Service: WARRANT Returned Executed as to Defendant $3,760.00 in United States Currency on 9/6/2018. (dmn, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 US Marshal Acknowledgement of Service: WARRANT Returned Executed as to Defendant $4,400.00 in United States Currency on 9/6/2018. (dmn, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 US Marshal Acknowledgement of Service: WARRANT Returned Executed as to Defendant $10,450.00 in United States Currency, served 9/6/2018. (dmn, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 US Marshal Acknowledgement of Service: WARRANT Returned Executed as to Defendant $15,000.00 in United States Currency on 9/6/2018. (dmn, )
September 5, 2018 *** Attorney Kevin P Davidson terminated pursuant to Text Order (Doc. 7 ). (dmn, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Assistant United States Attorney Kevin P. Davidson to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/5/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America. (Davidson, Kevin)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Randolph Neeley on behalf of United States of America (Neeley, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for United States of America. (dmn, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest In Rem issued. US Marshal 285 forms and service materials hand delivered to US Marshal for service. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal 285 Forms) (dmn, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (dmn, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $10,450.00 in United States Currency, $15,000.00 in United States Currency, $3,760.00 in United States Currency, $4,400.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $15,000.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,000.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,760.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,400.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,450.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin P Davidson
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maurice Kemmerlin
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Cox
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darolyn Kemmerlin
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terence Boley
Represented By: Randy Bruce Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?