ShowCoat Solutions, LLC v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: ShowCoat Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Andy Butler, Chris Wilson and Harmon Butler
Case Number: 1:2018cv00789
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting our further briefing requirements. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/2/2018. (alm, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2019, in Montgomery, AL, before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019, in Dothan, AL, before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 4/15/2019; Mediation Notice due by 3/11/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2019; Discovery due by 3/6/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/31/2018. (furn: calendar, wr) (wcl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ott, Ann)
October 15, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andy Butler, Harmon Butler, Chris Wilson.(Ott, Ann) Modified on 10/16/2018 to remove the "Jury Demand" from the docket text as it is not requested in the pleading (wcl, ).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/11/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
October 8, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Andy Butler, Harmon Butler, Chris Wilson. (Ott, Ann)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/4/2018. (dmn, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, #6 Order for Hearing served on Chris Wilson on 09/24/2018, filed by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (Hargrove, Travis) Modified on 10/3/2018 to create link to Doc. #6 . (dmn, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER that the #2 Motion for TRO be denied as moot in light of the parties' #19 Consent order for interlocutory injunction. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/28/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING INTERLOCUTORY INJUNCTION: the court enters the following ORDER: 1) All Dfts shall cease using the name "ShowCoat," "Volumax," "Pop Shot," or using the ShowCoat or similar marks in the manufacture, marketing, or sale of any goods, or acting in concert with others to do the same; 2) All Dfts shall not manufacture, market, or sell any products developed in whole or in part from the ShowCoat formula or acting in concert with others to do the same; 3) All parties shall preserve and demand the preservation of all computers, computer tablets, phones, smart phones, external media (CDs, thumb drives, external hard drives, and the like), servers, cloud-based storage, and email accounts on which they have stored any communication or information with, about, referring to and/or relating to ShowCoat, ShowCoat's marks, ShowCoat's formula; 4) All parties shall preserve and demand the preservation of all materials related to the manufacture, marketing, or sale of livestock hair-enhancement products. Nothing herein prevents any party from carrying on its normal business operations except as otherwise prohibited by this order; 5) Plf, its agents, officers, and members shall refrain from using Dfts' names or disclosing identifying information about Dfts in connection with this matter, or acting in concert with others to do the same. In addition, Plf shall delete, destroy, or remove, to the extent possible, all press releases, announcements, social media posts, or any other public materials it has produced using Dfts' names or disclosing identifying information about Dfts in connection with this matter. Nothing herein prevents Plf from informing the public that Wilson and Butler are no longer dealers for Plf, nor that there may be counterfeit products in circulation in the market, but such information shall not be presented in a way that implicates Dfts or associates them with wrongdoing; 6) No security will be required at this time; 7) This order shall remain in effect during the pendency of this litigation and until further order of the court; and 8) The 9/26/2018 hearing on this matter is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/25/2018. (furn: calendar, wr) (wcl, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Order to Cancel Hearing and Enter Consent Interlocutory Injunction by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hargrove, Travis) Modified on 9/25/2018 to add as also filed on behalf of the dfts and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. Harmon Butler served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Hargrove, Travis)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. Andy Butler served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Hargrove, Travis)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Order signed by Chris Wilson for Chris Wilson served on 9/14/2018. (wcl, ) Modified on 9/18/2018 to correct the docket text to reflect service of the #6 Order and not the Summons and #1 Complaint; Answer deadline has been terminated as service of the summons by process server has not been entered on the docket (wcl, ).
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Submission to Jurisdiction and Venue by Chris Wilson. (Ott, Ann) Modified on 9/18/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Order signed by Andy Butler for: Andy Bulter and Harmon Butler served on 9/14/2018. (wcl, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: the parties have agreed to the following interim ORDER: 1) All Dfts shall cease using the name "ShowCoat," "Volumax," "Pop Shot," or using the ShowCoat or similar marks in the manufacture, marketing, or sale of any goods, or acting in concert with others to do the same; 2) All Dfts shall not manufacture, market, or sell any products developed in whole or in part from the ShowCoat formula or acting in concert with others to do the same; 3) All parties shall preserve and demand the preservation of all computers, computer tablets, phones, smart phones, external media (CDs, thumb drives, external hard drives, and the like), servers, cloud-based storage, and email accounts on which they have stored any communication or information with, about, referring to and/or relating to ShowCoat, ShowCoat's marks, ShowCoat's formula; 4) All parties shall preserve and demand the preservation of all materials related to the manufacture, marketing, or sale of livestock hair-enhancement products. Nothing herein prevents any party from carrying on its normal business operations except as otherwise prohibited by this order; 5) Plf, its agents, officers, and members shall refrain from using Dfts' names or disclosing identifying information about Dfts in connection with this matter, or acting in concert with others to do the same. In addition, Plf shall delete, destroy, or remove, to the extent possible, all press releases, announcements, social media posts, or any other public materials it has produced using Dfts' names or disclosing identifying information about Dfts in connection with this matter. Nothing herein prevents Plf from informing the public that Wilson and Butler are no longer dealers for Plf, nor that there may be counterfeit products in circulation in the market, but such information shall not be presented in a way that implicates Dfts or associates them with wrongdoing; 6) No security will be required at this time; and 7) The 9/14/2018 hearing on this matter is CONTINUED until 9/26/2018, at 9:00 AM, in Courtroom 2B of the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/17/2018. (furn: calendar, wr) (Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2018 @ 09:00 AM in CR 2B re #2 Motion for TRO) (wcl, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2018 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Risa Entrekin.) (Attachments: #1 Witness List, #2 Pltf Exhibit List, #3 Pltf Exhibits) (kcf, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chris Wilson. (Ott, Ann)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harmon Butler. (Ott, Ann)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Andy Butler. (Ott, Ann)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Ashton Holmes Ott on behalf of All Defendants (Ott, Ann)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for temporary restraining order (Doc. #2 ), which is supported by a verified complaint (Doc. #1 ), it is ORDERED that a hearing is set for September 14, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., at the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse, One Church Street, Courtroom 2-B, Montgomery, Alabama. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for this hearing. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/11/2018. (furn; calendar, wr) (kh, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andy Butler, Harmon Butler, Chris Wilson; returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (wcl, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (wcl, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(wcl, )
September 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andy Butler, Harmon Butler, Chris Wilson (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050632.), filed by ShowCoat Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ShowCoat Solutions, LLC v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Butler
Represented By: Ann Ashton Holmes Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Wilson
Represented By: Ann Ashton Holmes Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon Butler
Represented By: Ann Ashton Holmes Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ShowCoat Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Travis Carlisle Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?