Meadows v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Carla Jane Meadows
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00910
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for Life Insurance Company of North America to 12/28/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #6 for pdf.)
November 14, 2018 ***Attorney Grace Robinson Murphy added for Life Insurance Company of North America. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #6 for pdf.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carla Jane Meadows. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Martin, David) Modified on 11/19/2018 to include answer deadline. (dmn, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons signed by Laura McHarren for Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/1/2018. (Martin, David) Modified on 11/19/2018 to remove answer deadline text, set erroneously. (dmn, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Life Insurance Company of North America on 10/29/2018 by Carla Jane Meadows. Waiver of Service due by 11/28/2018. (Martin, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Carla Jane Meadows. (djy, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carla Jane Meadows. (djy, ) Modified on 10/29/2018 to correct filed date on docket entry (qc/djy, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051130.), filed by Carla Jane Meadows. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Jane Meadows
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?