Pearson v. Experian (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Pearson
Defendant: Experian and Equifax
Case Number: 1:2019cv00204
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 Evidentiary Submission re #1 Complaint filed by Lorenzo Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(am, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING #12 Order, which denied Plf's #10 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis as moot and ordered 1915(e) review of Plf's #11 "Amended Verified Complaint" ; further ORDERING that the original defendant Experian in plf's #1 complaint be reinstated in the styled case and the current def Equifax be STRICKEN from the case; additionally ORDERING the clerk to STRIKE plf's #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and what has been styled as plf's #11 Amended Verified Complaint from the record in this case and to open a new case with those documents. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/29/19. (djy, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (VACATED pursuant to #13 ORDER) ORDER: DENYING as MOOT Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the case remains stayed pending the Court's obligatory review of Plaintif's #11 Amended Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/26/2019. (am, ) Modified on 4/29/2019 (djy, ).
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 (STRICKEN pursuant to #13 ORDER) AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Equifax, filed by Lorenzo Pearson.(am, ) Modified on 4/29/2019 (djy, ). (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/29/2019) (djy, ).
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 (STRICKEN pursuant to #13 ORDER) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lorenzo Pearson. (am, ) Modified on 4/29/2019 (djy, ). (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/29/2019) (djy, ).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: GRANTING #8 MOTION to Amend filed by Lorenzo Pearson; further ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 5/8/2019, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/24/2019. (am, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend filed by Lorenzo Pearson. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; DIRECTING the clerk to stay service of the case pending the Court's obligatory review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/9/2019. (am, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Long Form Application to Proceed in forma pauperis re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. by Lorenzo Pearson.(am, )
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 4/9/2019, Plf shall amend his pending Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by completing and filing the Court's long-form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order; copy of AO 239 IFP Long form mailed as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 3/26/2019. (wcl, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Stephen Michael Doyle for all pretrial proceedings and for the entry of any orders and recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/25/2019. (wcl, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lorenzo Pearson. (wcl, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lorenzo Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(wcl, )
March 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lorenzo Pearson. (NO pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian, filed by Lorenzo Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-part 1, #2 Exhibit B-part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wcl, ) . Modified on 4/29/2019 (djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Experian (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?