Reynolds v. Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Heather McRee Reynolds
Defendant: Anthem, Inc. and Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than August 19, 2019, as further set out in order. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before August 19, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/18/2019. (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Anthem, Inc., Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Anthem, Inc., Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company.(Kimble, Cavender)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Anthem, Inc., Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company. (Kimble, Cavender)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting the motion for extension of time to answer (Doc. #8 ). Defendants may file an answer or responsive pleading on or before July 15, Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/28/2019.(no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Anthem, Inc., Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company. (Kimble, Cavender)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Rick B. for Anthem, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (kh, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (kh, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anthem, Inc., Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Heather McRee Reynolds (kh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heather McRee Reynolds. (kh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthem, Inc., Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053785.), filed by Heather McRee Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: Cavender Crosby Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Georgia Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Cavender Crosby Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather McRee Reynolds
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David Kenneth Hogg
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?