Allied World Insurance Company v. Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Insurance Company
Defendant: Shakir Meghani, Jeffrey Todd Norris and Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00424
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Todd Norris re #13 Summons with the following notation, "Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. (am, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of Alias Summons & Complaint signed by Emily Turner for Shakir Meghani served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (am, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of Alias Summons & Complaint signed by Emily Turner for Jeffrey Todd Norris served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (am, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of Alias Summons & Complaint signed by Emily Turner for Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (am, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Alias Summons issued as to Shakir Meghani, Jeffrey Todd Norris, & Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C. and mailed CMRRR w/copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C. with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward; "Counsel is notified via this notice regarding un-perfected service. (am, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Shakir Meghani with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward;"Counsel is notified via this notice regarding un-perfected service.(am, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Shakir Meghani, Jeffrey Todd Norris, & Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C. and mailed CMRRR w/copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re: #7 Motion for James Geiser $75.00, receipt number 4602054090. (am, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re: #8 Motion for Charles Jones: $75.00, receipt number 4602054091. (am, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re: #6 Motion for Jordan Rubinsetein: $75.00, receipt number 4602054089. (am, ) Modified on 7/3/2019 to correct receipt number (am, ).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 , #7 , and #8 Motions for counsel Rubenstein, Geiser, and Jones Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/1/2019. (djy, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Charles Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allied World Insurance Company. (Wall, Jennifer) Modified on 7/1/2019 to clarify text to include attorney's name (qc/djy, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for James Geiser to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allied World Insurance Company. (Wall, Jennifer) Modified on 7/1/2019 to clarify text to include attorney's name (qc/djy, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Jordan Rubinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allied World Insurance Company. (Wall, Jennifer) Modified on 7/1/2019 to clarify text to include attorney's name (qc/djy, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Allied World Insurance Company re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Wall, Jennifer)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. and Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Allied World Insurance Company. (am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Allied World Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Rescission & Recoupment against Shakir Meghani, Jeffrey Todd Norris, & Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C., filed by Allied World Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602053942.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Insurance Company v. Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shakir Meghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Todd Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Resource Management of Wiregrass, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles A. Jones
Represented By: James H. Geiser
Represented By: Jennifer Williams Wall
Represented By: Jordan M. Rubinstein
Represented By: Elliot Britton Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?