Smith v. M1 Support Services (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Smith
Defendant: M1 Support Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00443
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Filing fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054500. (cnw, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; Plaintiff is directed to pay the requisite filing fee on or before 8/16/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/2/2019. (kr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Dennis Lee Smith; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement) (copy mailed to plf with form)(cnw, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Stephen Michael Doyle for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/26/2019. (cnw, )
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Dennis Lee Smith; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Southern District of Alabama; Case Number 1:19-cv-00293-JB-MU. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk.(cnw, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, entered by ALSD, that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/20/2019. (cnw, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against M1 Support Services, filed in ALSD, by Dennis Lee Smith.(cnw, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed in ALSD, by Dennis Lee Smith. (cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. M1 Support Services (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?