City of Daleville, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Daleville, Alabama
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals and Mallinckrodt, PLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00566
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Received email from OHND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; OHND case number assigned as 1:19-op-45778. (No PDF attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 9/4/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio.(wcl, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/3/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Moved Left No Address, Unable To Forward, Return To Sender." Counsel is notified via this notice regarding unperfected service. (wcl, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by CT Corporation for: Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (wcl, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to McKesson Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Cardinal Health, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
August 30, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #17 MOTION - Attorney Tiffany Johnson DeGruy for Cardinal Health, Inc., Harlan Irby Prater, IV for McKesson Corporation added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Strubel, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment) (wcl, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by J. G. for Actavis, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (wcl, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (wcl, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by illegible for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 9/6/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by Paul Sisfo for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by A Verna for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by Julie Buckner for: Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; Cephalon, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019; Noramco, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by K. Webster for: McKesson Corporation served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (wcl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Daleville, Alabama. (wcl, )
August 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Daleville, Alabama. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054501.), filed by City of Daleville, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Daleville, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Johnson DeGruy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Daleville, Alabama
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?